+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ707ER)
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 11103997D
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 11103997D