+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ705ER)
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 15101447D
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor