+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ703ER)
On January 25, 2001 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Taken up
On January 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 11, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 017672940-E
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 017672940
- Prefiled; 01/10/01
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor