+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 27, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ701ER)
On February 22, 1995 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
- Reading waived
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
On February 14, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed LD5460296
- Consent to introduce