+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 22, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ700ER)
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Title replaced
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House(Block Vote)(90-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 990796276
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1999: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor