+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in P. & E. (15-Y 7-N)
On January 20, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 1
On January 15, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 1
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 033709577
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 31, 2003: Passed by indefinitely in P. & E. (15-Y 7-N)
January 15, 2003: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor