+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ699ER)
On January 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 16, 2009 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 094319528
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/14/09 094319528
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor