+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 22, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ692ER)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Education (24-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 996812252
+ − Votes (3)
February 17, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1999: Reported from Education (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor