+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 22, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ691ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (93-Y 6-N)
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 991437128-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 991437128-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 991437128-S1
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 996641128-E
- Taken up
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (92-Y 7-N)
- Agreed to by House (85-Y 12-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 12-N)
- Motion to reconsider passage by Mr. Clement agreed to
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Agreed to by House (92-Y 7-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (11-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 996641128
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N)
February 22, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 12-N)
February 7, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (92-Y 7-N)
February 3, 1999: Reported from Rules with amendments (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor