+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 9, 2001 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On February 24, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ685ER)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Substitute bill reprinted 014374836-H1
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 017959836-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 017959836-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 017959836-S1
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 014374835-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 014374836-H1
- Taken up
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 014374836-H1
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 019220836