+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Failed to Report in Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: #1
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended HJ68E
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 10101347D-E
- Agreed to by House (72-Y 26-N)
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (72-Y 26-N)
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (11-Y 4-N)
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 2-N)
- Reconsidered by Subcommittee
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 2-N)
On January 18, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101347D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 15, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (72-Y 26-N)
February 11, 2010: Reported from Rules with amendment (11-Y 4-N)
February 8, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 2-N)
January 28, 2010: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor