+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter 756 (effective - see bill)
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0756)
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ679ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 2-N)
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N)
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: #1 Constitutional
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 11100719D
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2011: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2011: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2011: Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 2-N)
January 31, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor