+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ674ER)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102046D