+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ67ER)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 12, 2018 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/10/18 18103903D
+ − Vote
March 2, 2018: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor