+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Left in Rules (Subject matter referred to Senate Tra.)
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived (36-Y 4-N)
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 971385430
+ − Votes (2)
February 2, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1997: Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor