+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left in Rules
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (64-Y 31-N)
- Agreed to by House (64-Y 31-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (12-Y 3-N)
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 15102451D
+ − Votes (2)
February 5, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (64-Y 31-N)
January 30, 2015: Reported from Rules (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor