+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ665ER)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On January 31, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (36-Y 4-N)
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 974302144-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 974302144-H1
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 974302144-H1
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed 978292256
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1997: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1997: Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor