+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ659ER)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105504D-S2 (100-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HJ659S2
- Substitute by Senator Ebbin agreed to 15105504D-S2
- Floor substitute printed 15105504D-S2 (Ebbin)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 15101883D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15105464D-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (70-Y 2-N)
- Agreed to by House (70-Y 2-N)
- Printed as engrossed 15101883D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HJ659E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Taken up
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 15101883D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 26, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (70-Y 2-N)
January 30, 2015: Reported from Rules with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor