+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 3, 1999 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On March 16, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ658ER)
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 8-N)
- Agreed to by House (92-Y 8-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 996436114