+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ651ER)
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 15101459D
- Passed by for the day
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 15101459D
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor