+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 8, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ643ER)
On February 26, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senators: Norment, Hawkins, Williams
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- Delegates: Hogan, Griffith, Abbitt
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on amendment
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (1-Y 97-N)
- Senate amendment rejected by House (1-Y 97-N)
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Amendment by Sen. Norment agreed to
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Agreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 052089324