+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 22, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ642ER)
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House(Block Vote)(90-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 996680430-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Taken up
On January 30, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 996680430
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1999: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor