+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 22, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ640ER)
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (90-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 038020688
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 17, 2003: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2003: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2003: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor