+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 14, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ640ER)
On February 26, 2005 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (90-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate
On February 26, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senators: Stosch, Hanger, Watkins
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- Delegates: Callahan, Cox, Joannou
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (1-Y 95-N)
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Passed by temporarily
- Floor substitute printed 054701824-S1 (Stosch)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendments rejected
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Sen. Stosch agreed to 054701824-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HJ640S1
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 051667468-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HJ640E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Taken up
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 051667468