+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ64ER)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101039D
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2018: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2018: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor