+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ637ER)
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Motion to reconsider Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 078907103-E
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (91-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended HJ637E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Taken up
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 078907103
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2007: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor