+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ635ER)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 4-N 3-A)
- Agreed to by House (85-Y 4-N 3-A)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 1-N)
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102420D
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 2015: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 4-N 3-A)
February 6, 2015: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor