+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ632ER)
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/11/17 17101297D
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor