+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ631ER)
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/14/15 15101663D
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor