+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ621ER)
On January 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On January 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 20, 1999 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 996067443
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor