+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 22, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ620ER)
On January 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On January 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 10, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Printed as engrossed 033624627-E
- Engrossed by House
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 033624627
- Prefiled; 01/07/03