+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 18, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ619ER)
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 978077351-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 978077351-H1
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 978077351-H1
- Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Reported from Agriculture (20-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 973772761
+ − Votes (4)
February 18, 1997: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1997: Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 1997: Reported from Agriculture (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor