+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 10, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ617ER)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 971354120-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 971354120
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1997: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1997: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor