+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ613ER)
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 13102523D
On January 7, 2013 in the House:
- Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/09/13 13102523D
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor