+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ612ER)
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On January 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101676D
+ − Votes (3)
February 13, 2017: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2017: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor