+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 23, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ610ER)
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Readings waived
- Taken up for immediate consideration
- Discharged from Rules
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (8-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed LD5391298
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 1995: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1995: Reported from Rules (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor