+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in P. & E. (8-Y 5-N)
On February 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 2
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Reading waived
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House (88-Y 8-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 8-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 018701924-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 018701924-H1
- Taken up
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 018701924-H1
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (19-Y 3-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 012804924
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 2001: Passed by indefinitely in P. & E. (8-Y 5-N)
February 6, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 8-N)
February 1, 2001: Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (19-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor