+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ608ER)
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Taken up
- Engrossed by House
- VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 13-N)
- Agreed to by House (82-Y 13-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Education (16-Y 7-N)
On January 22, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 2
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 014312964