+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left in Rules
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (63-Y 33-N)
- Agreed to by House (66-Y 33-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Amendment #2 by Delegate Lopez ruled not germane
- Amendment #1 by Delegate Lopez rejected
- Pending question ordered
- Taken up
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (12-Y 3-N)
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101506D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
February 5, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (63-Y 33-N)
January 30, 2015: Reported from Rules (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor