+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ608ER)
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: #1
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104105D-H1
- Taken up
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ608H1
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11104105D-H1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101946D
+ − Votes (3)
February 21, 2011: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2011: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor