+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 3, 1999 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On March 16, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ606ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 3-N)
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 4-N)
- Agreed to by House (96-Y 4-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 20, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 995121312