+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 21103484D
+ − Votes (3)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2021: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2021: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor