+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 5, 2010 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ60ER)
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote
On February 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: #1
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies
On January 11, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103568D