+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (12-Y 3-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Reading waived
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (61-Y 35-N)
- Agreed to by House (61-Y 35-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ594H1
- Pending question ordered
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104324D-H1
- Taken up
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Incorporates HJ677
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104324D-H1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments Subcommittee
On January 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100573D