+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ593ER)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100989D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2019: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2019: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor