+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 22, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ59ER)
On January 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Taken up
On January 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 21, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 19, 1994 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table