+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 10, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ59ER)
On January 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 21, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 18, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 006450956-E
On January 17, 2000 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 006450956
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor