+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 3, 1999 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On March 16, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ588ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 20-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (79-Y 20-N)
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 992757476-E
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 15-N)
- Agreed to by House (82-Y 15-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Taken up
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 20, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 992757476
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 20-N)
February 22, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 15-N)
February 3, 1999: Reported from Rules with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor