+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ588ER)
On March 12, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ588ER)
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived (36-Y 4-N)
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 975914212
+ − Votes (4)
February 18, 1997: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1997: Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (118)
Type:
Primary Sponsor