+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Rules (1-Y 15-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/03/03 034097896
+ − Votes (3)
February 10, 2003: Failed to report (defeated) in Rules (1-Y 15-N)
January 30, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2003: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor